RI H7070 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the development of curriculums/policies/programs relating to the health risks of e-cigarettes.
Title
Health And Safety Of Pupils
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. John Lyle [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/12/2020) |
2020-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7070.pdf |