RI H7062 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that in developing alternative-learning plans, consideration shall be given to the difficulties and interruptions students experience because of the COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Compulsory Attendance
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Jacquelyn Baginski [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Steven Lima [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2022) |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2022-06-01 | House | House read and passed |
2022-05-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/01/2022) |
2022-05-18 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2022) |
2022-01-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/26/2022) |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |