RI H7062 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a voluntary deduction from any refund from the Rhode Island personal income tax for a contribution to the substance use and mental health leadership council of RI.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-22 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2018) |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |