RI H7062 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for a voluntary deduction from any refund from the Rhode Island personal income tax for a contribution to the substance use and mental health leadership council of RI.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal Income Tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-05-02HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2018)
2018-01-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback