RI H7061 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a college or university from withholding a student's academic transcript due to outstanding tuition fees.
Title
Council On Postsecondary Education [see Title 16 Chapter 97 -- The Rhode Island Board Of Education Act]
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Jacquelyn Baginski [D] |
Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Steven Lima [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/26/2022) |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7061.pdf |