RI H7061 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-23 - House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Policies And Procedures Relating To Substance Abuse, Mental Health, And Related Services (substitutes Office Of Health Insurance Commissioner For Director Of Dbr As Overseer Of Health Ins. Claims, Amends Definitions, Sets Guidelines To Determine Whether Substantial Compliance Has Been Met. Requires Eohhs To Impose Timely Claims Procedure.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Policies And Procedures Relating To Substance Abuse, Mental Health, And Related Services (substitutes Office Of Health Insurance Commissioner For Director Of Dbr As Overseer Of Health Ins. Claims, Amends Definitions, Sets Guidelines To Determine Whether Substantial Compliance Has Been Met. Requires Eohhs To Impose Timely Claims Procedure.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-23HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2018-06-22HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-22HouseScheduled for consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-05-02HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2018)
2018-01-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback