RI H7058 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a transitioning veterans' small business loan program through the commerce corporation.
Title
Veterans' Small Business Loan Program
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Lancia [R] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. Kenneth Mendonca [R] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2018) |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7058.pdf |