RI H7057 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Pawtucket to provide a tax exemption for all real and personal property owned by One Thousand and One United, Inc., a RI nonprofit corporation, which is used by the Revival Deliverance Edification Center Church for religious purposes.
Title
Authorizing The City Of Pawtucket To Exempt From Taxation The Real And Personal Property Of One Thousand And One United, Inc.
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. Patrick O'Neil [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-01-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/23/2014) |
2014-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |