RI H7054 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of The Pawtucket Teachers Alliance
Title
An Act To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of The Pawtucket Teachers Alliance
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Roberto DaSilva [D] | Rep. Peter Kilmartin [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-02-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-02-09 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2010-02-04 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2010-01-13 | House read and passed | |
2010-01-07 | Placed on House Calendar |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7054.pdf |