RI H7051 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

In Amendment Of Chapter 330 Of The Public Laws Of 1997 As Amended By Chapter 140 Of The Public Laws Of 2006, Pertaining To Sewers In The Town Of Coventry

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Amendment Of Chapter 330 Of The Public Laws Of 1997 As Amended By Chapter 140 Of The Public Laws Of 2006, Pertaining To Sewers In The Town Of Coventry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-25HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-01-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/25/2018)
2018-01-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback