RI H7049 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a procedure for military service members and their spouses to obtain certifications and licenses issued by the department of environmental management.
Title
Department Of Environmental Management
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. James McLaughlin [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2018) |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7049.pdf |