RI H7048 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Meeting postponed (06/14/2018)
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates an 11 member legislative commission to study procedures to expedite the certification and licensure of military service members and their spouses by the DMV and DOA, and who would report back by March 12, 2019, and expire on June 12, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Division Of Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14HouseMeeting postponed (06/14/2018)
2018-06-08HouseScheduled for consideration
2018-02-08HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2018)
2018-01-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback