RI H7046 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the sale and/or delivery of hearing aids directly to consumer through internet or direct mail, and provides for criminal penalties.
Title
Hearing Aid Dealers And Fitters
Sponsors
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/19/2016) |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7046.pdf |