RI H7045 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits mistreatment of animals by failing to provide adequate water, shelter or veterinary care.
Title
Care Of Dogs
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - Passage (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - Passage (Y: 52 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - Passage (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - Passage (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - Passage (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - Passage (Y: 52 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - Passage (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - Passage (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | House | House passed Sub B in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2018-04-04 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-03-30 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/04/2018) |
2018-03-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2018) |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |