RI H7044 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permits that age-appropriate and developmentally appropriate education on consent and sexual activity be increased in secondary schools as part of a family life course.
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2018) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2018-03-14 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-03-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/14/2018) |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-02-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/14/2018) |
2018-01-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/24/2018) |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |