RI H7041 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that effective January 1, 2019, all school buildings where students are in attendance would be required to have carbon monoxide detectors installed and maintained therein.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health And Safety Of Pupils

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-06-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23HouseScheduled for consideration (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-06-21SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-06-21SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-19SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-15SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Senate Education
2018-02-27HouseHouse read and passed
2018-02-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (02/27/2018)
2018-02-14HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-02-09HouseScheduled for consideration (02/14/2018)
2018-01-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-01-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/24/2018)
2018-01-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback