RI H7039 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires motor vehicle dealers to disclose in writing that a vehicle being sold has a spare tire/ jack or is otherwise equipped in compliance with applicable law. There shall be a civil penalty of $100 for a violation under this section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dealerships

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateReferred to Senate Commerce
2018-03-29HouseHouse read and passed
2018-03-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/29/2018)
2018-03-20HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-03-16HouseScheduled for consideration (03/20/2018)
2018-03-12HouseMeeting postponed (03/13/2018)
2018-03-09HouseScheduled for consideration
2018-01-23HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-01-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/23/2018)
2018-01-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback