RI H7033 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Require certain large commercial food scrap generators and covered educational institutions/facilities to divert food residuals to composting facilities.
Title
Food Residuals Recycling
Sponsors
Rep. Donna Walsh [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] |
Rep. Linda Finn [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage of amendment (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-03-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2014) |
2014-02-03 | House | Meeting postponed (02/06/2014) |
2014-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |