RI H7031 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State Of Rhode Island (sessions Of General Assembly) (proposes A Constitutional Amendment Which, If Approved By The Voters, Changes The Opening Date Of The General Assembly To The First Tuesday After The First Monday In January, And Provides For Adjournment No Later Than The Friday Preceding Memorial Day.)
Title
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State Of Rhode Island (sessions Of General Assembly) (proposes A Constitutional Amendment Which, If Approved By The Voters, Changes The Opening Date Of The General Assembly To The First Tuesday After The First Monday In January, And Provides For Adjournment No Later Than The Friday Preceding Memorial Day.)
Sponsors
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Moira Walsh [D] | Rep. John Lyle [R] |
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2020) |
2020-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7031.pdf |