RI H7028 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Amending The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The Years 2013-2014 (amending Rules)
Title
House Resolution Amending The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The Years 2013-2014 (amending Rules)
Sponsors
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Patrick O'Neil [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Doreen Costa [R] |
Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/12/2014) |
2014-01-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Rules Committee |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7028.pdf |