RI H7027 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires bidders on public school construction contracts of $5,000,000 or more to have an apprenticeships program compliant with chapter and truthful reporting of program data to DOLT effective July 1, 2022.
Title
Labor And Payment Of Debts By Contractors
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] |
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/02/2022) |
2022-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7027.pdf |