RI H7024 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes it a felony to price gouge prescriptions or pharmaceuticals in time of a shortage.
Title
Relating To Commercial Law-- General Regulatory Provisions
Sponsors
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] |
Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Brianna Henries [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2022) |
2022-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7024.pdf |