RI H7023 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- EXTENDED PRODUCER RESPONSIBILITY FOR PACKAGING - Reduces equitable relationships between packaging producers and local governments and communities by establishing the Package Reduction and Recycling Program.
Title
Reduces equitable relationships between packaging producers and local governments and communities by establishing the Package Reduction and Recycling Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-01-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7023.pdf |