RI H7023 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires initial, biennial, and continuing education in land use law and planning for local planning and zoning board members and members of historic district commissions.
Title
Local Planning Board Or Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-17 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Committee on Judiciary: Passage of Sub A (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Committee on Judiciary: Passage of Sub A (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-25 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-17 | House | House passed Sub B in concurrence |
2022-06-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2022) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/14/2022) |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2022-02-17 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-02-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/17/2022) |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-02-09 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-02-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/10/2022) |
2022-01-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/25/2022) |
2022-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |