RI H7020 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House Resolution Amending The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The Years 2017-2018 (proposes An Amendment To The House Rules Establishing A Standing Caucus To Be Known As The "freshman Caucus".)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Resolution Amending The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The Years 2017-2018 (proposes An Amendment To The House Rules Establishing A Standing Caucus To Be Known As The "freshman Caucus".)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018)
2018-04-17HouseMeeting postponed
2018-04-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-01-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House Rules Committee

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback