RI H7015 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Taxation - Property Subject To Taxation (would Provide That Any Exemption Or Freeze Of Tax Rate And/or Valuation Granted To Any Individual Is Not Affected If Such Eligible Individual Transfers The Subject Property To An Irrevocable Living Trust.)
Title
An Act Relating To Taxation - Property Subject To Taxation (would Provide That Any Exemption Or Freeze Of Tax Rate And/or Valuation Granted To Any Individual Is Not Affected If Such Eligible Individual Transfers The Subject Property To An Irrevocable Living Trust.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-07 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2012) | |
2012-01-04 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7015.pdf |