RI H7010 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that any person who has a retail sales permit not be required to pay a separate registration fee to make sales at flea markets; provided, however, the person remains responsible to pay all taxes due as a result of sales at a flea market.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales And Use Taxes--enforcement And Collection

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2018)
2018-01-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback