RI H7006 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Training School."
Title
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Kenneth Carter [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Gordon Fox [D] |
Rep. William Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-01-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-01-13 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2010-01-07 | House read and passed | |
2010-01-05 | Placed on House Calendar |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7006.pdf |