RI H7002 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires individual or group policy insurance to cover mastectomies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-06-19HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-16HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-12HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-08HouseScheduled for consideration (06/12/2018)
2018-04-03HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018)
2018-02-10HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (02/13/2018)
2018-02-09HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-01-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback