RI H6676 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/16/2022)
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/16/2022)
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Same as 21H-5634 -- Requires cities and towns to assess renewable energy resources to be taxed as tangible property and the real property on which it is located shall not be reclassified, revalued or reassessed.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/16/2022) |
2022-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H6676.pdf |