RI H6673 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Same as 21H-5082 -- Expressly allows college athletes, while they are students, to personally profit from the use of their name, image, and likeness, and prohibits the NCAA from preventing these practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Compensation For Students Participating In Intercollegiate Athletics

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-13 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-01SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2022-05-27SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/01/2022)
2022-04-26SenateReferred to Senate Education
2022-04-13HouseHouse read and passed
2022-04-08HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/13/2022)
2022-04-06HouseCommittee recommends passage
2022-04-01HouseScheduled for consideration (04/06/2022)
2022-01-06HouseIntroduced, referred to House Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback