RI H6665 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Same as 21H-5931 -- Requires free lunches to be provided for all elementary and secondary students attending public schools, to the extent state and federal funds are available.
Title
Federal Aid
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-06-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2022) |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H6665.pdf |