RI H6661 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Same as 21H-5284 -- Requires that the primary election date, typically the eighth Tuesday preceding the biennial state elections, shall be held on the Wednesday immediately following Labor Day, only if the eighth Tuesday immediately follows Labor Day.
Title
Primary Election Dates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/27/2022) |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H6661.pdf |