RI H6658 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Same as 21H-5213 -- Changes the rate of interest for underpayments of tax to prime rate plus six percent (6%). Also limits the assessment of interest to four (4) calendar years prior to the date on which notice of the delinquent payment is sent.
Title
State Tax Officials
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Bernard Hawkins [D] | Rep. Steven Lima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2022) |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H6658.pdf |