RI H6654 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for consumer protection in eye care services by developing standards and enforcement protocols in the provision of eye care services.
Title
The Consumer Protection In Eye Care Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2022-06-02 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-05-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/02/2022) |
2022-05-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-20 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2022) |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |