RI H6650 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Same as 21H-5795 -- Establishes the office of inspector general as an independent administrative agency charged with the responsibility to investigate, detect, and prevent fraud, waste, abuse, and mismanagement in the expenditure of public funds.
Title
Establishing An Office Of Inspector General
Sponsors
Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] |
Rep. Justin Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2022) |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H6650.pdf |