RI H6647 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Same as 21H-5463--Requires group health plans and health insurance issuers that provide prescription benefits to cover prescribed epinephrine injectors and cartridges/No copayment or deductible would be required to obtain a prescribed epinephrine injector
Title
Medical Insurance Coverage For Epinephrine Injectors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/11/2022) |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H6647.pdf |