RI H6646 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Respectfully Urging The United States Congress To Pass Legislation Establishing An Improved "medicare For All" Single Payer Program That Would Provide Universal, Comprehensive And Affordable Health Care (same As 21h-6078--)
Title
House Resolution Respectfully Urging The United States Congress To Pass Legislation Establishing An Improved "medicare For All" Single Payer Program That Would Provide Universal, Comprehensive And Affordable Health Care (same As 21h-6078--)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2022) |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H6646.pdf |