RI H6642 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Same as 21H-5568 SUB A -- Provides planning board approval votes require majority of members present at time of vote/quorum of zoning review board would authorize voting members including alternatives.
Title
Subdivision Of Land -- Zoning Ordinances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-21 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2022-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/16/2022) |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2022) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | House | House read and passed |
2022-02-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/03/2022) |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-02-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/17/2022) |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |