RI H6633 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Same as 21H-6044 --Creates a special license plate for the not for profit Atlantic Shark Institute.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-24 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-06 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2022) |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2022-05-31 | House | House read and passed |
2022-05-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/31/2022) |
2022-05-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2022) |
2022-01-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/26/2022) |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |