RI H6632 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Same as 21H-5986 --Increases penalties for damages to electric/cellular communication lines from $3,000 to $50,000/imprisonment from 2 to 10 years, or both/requires restitution for economic harm/increases water supply systems imprisonment to 10 years plus
Title
Public Utilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/25/2022) |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H6632.pdf |