RI H6625 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Meeting postponed (05/11/2022)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Meeting postponed (05/11/2022)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Same as 21H-5444--Provides that school construction projects approved after July 1, 2022, that fail to utilize a project's architectural services and project educational design services would only be eligible to receive five (5) incentive points.
Title
School Building Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | House | Meeting postponed (05/11/2022) |
2022-05-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H6625.pdf |