RI H6621 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SEE TITLE 16 CHAPTER 97 -- THE RHODE ISLAND BOARD OF EDUCATION ACT) (Same as 21H-5352 -- Creates a local advisory committee on special education in every school district to advise the school district on matters concerning the unmet needs of students with disabilities.
Title
Children With Disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2022) |
2022-01-24 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (01/26/2022) |
2022-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H6621.pdf |