RI H6603 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Same as 21H-5522 SUB A/2 -- Establishes a process for CCRI, RIC and URI to accept for college credit an advanced placement subject test score of three (3) ("qualified") or better in an advanced placement course.
Title
Access To Advanced Placement Courses For All Students Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-17 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-06-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2022) |
2022-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-11 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2022) |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |