RI H6523 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Decreases the number of hours needed for the issuance of a license for hairdresser and cosmetician licensing from 1,200 hours to 1,000 hours.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Barbers, Hairdressers, Cosmeticians, Manicurists And Estheticians

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-15 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-22HouseSigned by Governor
2023-06-19HouseTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-16SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2023-06-15SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/15/2023)
2023-06-15HouseHouse read and passed
2023-06-14HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/15/2023)

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback