RI H6521 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the division of motor vehicles to issue a RI state identification card to residents unable to establish lawful presence in the United States upon proof of proper documentation as required with respect to driver privilege cards and permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver Privilege Cards And Permits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 60 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-22HouseSigned by Governor
2023-06-19HouseTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-15SenateSenate passed as amended in concurrence
2023-06-14SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023)
2023-06-14HouseHouse passed as amended (floor amendment)
2023-06-13HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/14/2023)
2023-06-13HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback