RI H6478 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts the Brain Injury Association of Rhode Island, Inc., a nonprofit corporation, located at 1017 Waterman Avenue within the city of East Providence on tax assessor's map 607, Block 11, Parcel 4

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Subject To Taxation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-27HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2023-06-19HouseTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-16SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2023-06-15SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023)
2023-06-15HouseHouse read and passed
2023-06-14HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/15/2023)
2023-06-14HouseCommittee recommends passage
2023-06-12HouseScheduled for consideration (06/14/2023)
2023-06-06HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-06-04HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2023)
2023-06-02HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback