RI H6467 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-01 - House passed as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Department of health to promulgate rules and regulations for essential caregivers at healthcare facilities during a declared emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patient Visitation Rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-01 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01HouseHouse passed as amended (floor amendment)
2021-06-29HousePlaced on House Calendar (07/01/2021)
2021-06-28HouseCommittee recommends passage
2021-06-25HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2021)
2021-06-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House Health & Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback