RI H6459 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Timothy Mullaney to join Erin Orleck and Michael Kölln in marriage on or about August 13, 2021, within the Town of Richmond, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-10 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-06-23 | House | House read and passed |