RI H6427 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the town of North Kingstown to issue bonds in the amount of twenty five million dollars ($25,000,000) to finance an indoor recreation center/emergency shelter upon voter approval.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing The Town Of North Kingstown To Issue Not More Than $25,000,000 Bonds And Notes To Finance An Indoor Recreation Center/emergency Shelter

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-19HouseSigned by Governor
2023-06-14HouseTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-13SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2023-06-08SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/13/2023)
2023-06-08HouseHouse read and passed
2023-06-06HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/08/2023)
2023-06-06HouseCommittee recommends passage
2023-06-04HouseScheduled for consideration (06/06/2023)
2023-05-30HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-05-26HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2023)
2023-05-19HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback